Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1117917
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.05.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] |
31.05.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] |
27.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.09.2001 |
First examination report |
|
14.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.06.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] |
08.06.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] |
17.01.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|