Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1117917 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2002 | B1 | EP1117917 | 25.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19844082 | 25.09.1998 | DE9902928 | 14.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59902070D1 | 22.08.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19844082 | 25.09.1998 | DE9902928 | 14.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0019075 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19844082 | 25.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100641462B | Global Dossier | 31.10.2006 | B1 | KR20010075350 | 09.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19844082 | 25.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19844082 | 14.10.1999 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE19844082 | 25.09.1998 |