EP1149033 - TABLET DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk Femcare AG Andreastrasse 15 8050 Zürich / CH | [2005/45] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDE, Christian Hannebjergvej 8 DK-2960 Rungsted Kyst / DK | 02 /
MCGUGAN, Steve Mortonsvej 21 DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | 03 /
LYKKE, Peter Max Heniusvej 32 DK-9000 Aalborg / DK | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Einar Tronier, et al c/o Novo Nordisk A/S, Patent Department, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Hansen, Einar Tronier, et al c/o Novo Nordisk A/S, Patent Department, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 99955837.2 | 09.11.1999 | [2001/44] | WO1999DK00610 | Priority number, date | DK19730009814 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: DK 981473 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0029306 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1149033 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149033 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/04 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
B65D83/0454 (EP);
B65D83/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/44] | Extension states | LT | 13.06.2001 | RO | 13.06.2001 | SI | 13.06.2001 | Title | German: | TABLETTENSPENDER | [2001/44] | English: | TABLET DISPENSER | [2001/44] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE COMPRIMES | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 02.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.11.2005 | GR | 10.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2007/23] |
Former [2006/30] | GR | 10.11.2005 | |
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | GR | 10.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB998765 (ORTHO PHARMA CORP); | [X]US3722739 (BLUMBERG M); | [X]EP0212464 (HOLTSCH MARIA METALLWAREN [DE]); | [A]EP0485819 (PFEIFFER ERICH GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP0578296 (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]); | [X]EP0807589 (ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]) |