EP1133368 - LOCKING DEVICE FOR SECURING A TOOL IN A MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AKI Invest ApS Stjernevej 21 8900 Randers / DK | [2003/38] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Ketler APS Agerskellet 46 8900 Randers / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iversen, Flemming Ketler Stjernevej 21 8900 Randers / DK | [2003/22] |
Former [2001/38] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al LARSEN & BIRKEHOLM A/S Skandinavisk Patentbureau Banegårdspladsen 1 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al Larsen & Birkeholm A/S, Banegaardspladsen 1, P.O. Box 362 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 99955845.5 | 18.11.1999 | [2001/38] | WO1999DK00635 | Priority number, date | DK19980001562 | 26.11.1998 Original published format: DK 156298 | [2001/38] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0030781 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133368 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133368 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B21D37/06 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
B21D5/0209 (EP);
B21D5/0236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/38] | Extension states | AL | 26.06.2001 | LT | 26.06.2001 | LV | 26.06.2001 | MK | 26.06.2001 | RO | 26.06.2001 | SI | 26.06.2001 | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSEINRICHTUNG ZUM FESTLEGEN EINES WERKZEUGS AN EINER MASCHINE | [2001/38] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE FOR SECURING A TOOL IN A MACHINE | [2001/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE POUR FIXER UN OUTIL A UNE MACHINE | [2001/38] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2001 | Translation filed | 26.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [2002/07] | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.2003 | BE | 05.11.2003 | CH | 05.11.2003 | FI | 05.11.2003 | FR | 05.11.2003 | IT | 05.11.2003 | LI | 05.11.2003 | NL | 05.11.2003 | CY | 18.11.2003 | IE | 18.11.2003 | LU | 18.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | DK | 05.02.2004 | GB | 05.02.2004 | GR | 05.02.2004 | SE | 05.02.2004 | DE | 06.02.2004 | ES | 16.02.2004 | PT | 05.04.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/31] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
FR | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
IE | 18.11.2003 | ||
LU | 18.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GB | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
FR | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
IE | 18.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
LU | 05.01.2004 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GB | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/16] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
IE | 18.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
LU | 05.01.2004 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GB | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
IE | 18.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GB | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GB | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GB | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 18.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 05.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3779122 (SAWVELL R); | [AD]EP0494714 (WILA MASCHF BV [NL]) |