EP1045712 - VENTILATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pulmonetic Systems, Inc. Suite 100, 930 South Mt. Vernon Avenue Colton, CA 92324 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Pulmonetic Systems, Inc. Suite 100, 930 South Mt. Vernon Avenue Colton, CA 92324 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE VRIES, Douglas, F. 30370 E. Sunset Drive South Redlands, CA 92373 / US | 02 /
HOLMES, Michael, B. 11031 Campbell Avenue Riverside, CA 92505 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Kjerrumgaard, Bent, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Kjerrumgaard, Bent, et al Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S, Vester Sogade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 99956657.3 | 25.10.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999US24953 | Priority number, date | US19980178466 | 23.10.1998 Original published format: US 178466 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0024447 | Date: | 04.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045712 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045712 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00, A61M16/12, A61M16/20 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
A61M16/20 (EP,US);
A61M16/0057 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP,US);
A61M16/12 (EP,US);
A61M16/204 (EP,US);
A61M16/205 (EP,US);
A61M16/0066 (EP,US);
A61M16/107 (EP,US);
A61M16/209 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2205/42 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/43] | A61M16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | VENTILATORSYSTEM | [2000/43] | English: | VENTILATOR SYSTEM | [2000/43] | French: | SYSTEME DE VENTILATION | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01124817.6 / EP1166815 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.08.2002 | BE | 07.08.2002 | CH | 07.08.2002 | FI | 07.08.2002 | GR | 07.08.2002 | LI | 07.08.2002 | MC | 07.08.2002 | NL | 07.08.2002 | IE | 25.10.2002 | LU | 25.10.2002 | CY | 31.10.2002 | DK | 07.11.2002 | SE | 07.11.2002 | PT | 22.11.2002 | ES | 28.02.2003 | [2013/21] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 07.08.2002 | |
BE | 07.08.2002 | ||
CH | 07.08.2002 | ||
FI | 07.08.2002 | ||
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
LI | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
IE | 25.10.2002 | ||
LU | 25.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.10.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
SE | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 07.08.2002 | |
BE | 07.08.2002 | ||
CH | 07.08.2002 | ||
FI | 07.08.2002 | ||
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
LI | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
IE | 25.10.2002 | ||
LU | 25.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.10.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 07.08.2002 | |
BE | 07.08.2002 | ||
CH | 07.08.2002 | ||
FI | 07.08.2002 | ||
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
LI | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
IE | 25.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.10.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 07.08.2002 | |
BE | 07.08.2002 | ||
CH | 07.08.2002 | ||
FI | 07.08.2002 | ||
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
LI | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
IE | 25.10.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 07.08.2002 | |
BE | 07.08.2002 | ||
CH | 07.08.2002 | ||
FI | 07.08.2002 | ||
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
LI | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
IE | 25.10.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 07.08.2002 | |
BE | 07.08.2002 | ||
CH | 07.08.2002 | ||
FI | 07.08.2002 | ||
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
LI | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 07.08.2002 | |
CH | 07.08.2002 | ||
FI | 07.08.2002 | ||
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
LI | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 07.08.2002 | |
CH | 07.08.2002 | ||
FI | 07.08.2002 | ||
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
LI | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 07.08.2002 | |
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 07.08.2002 | |
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 07.08.2002 | |
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | NL | 07.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2000443 (PHILIPS NV) [X] 13,14 * page 1, line 26 - line 51; figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 8 *[A] 12; | [XY]EP0164500 (DRAEGERWERK AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 26; figure 1 * [Y] 4,12; | [Y]US5331995 (WESTFALL THOMAS P [US], et al) [Y] 4-12 * column 7, line 6 - column 9, line 63; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US4957107 (SIPIN ANATOLE J [US]); | [A]US5237987 (ANDERSON RALPH [US], et al); | [A]US5241955 (DEARMAN PETER T [GB], et al); | [A]US5271389 (ISAZA FERNANDO J [US], et al); | [AP]US5881722 (DEVRIES DOUGLAS F [US], et al); | [AP]US5931159 (SUZUKI TETSUYA [JP], et al) | by applicant | US4957107 | US5694926 |