EP1127234 - ROTARY MOTION FEEDTHROUGH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigaku/usa, Inc. Northwoods Business Park, Suite 190, 199 Rosewood Drive Danvers MA 01923 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states Rigaku/usa, Inc. Northwoods Business Park, Suite 190, 199 Rosewood Drive Danvers, MA 01923 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHONEY, David, G. 5 Lafayette Road Londonderry, NH 03053 / US | 02 /
HELGELAND, Walter Lakeland Village 5B Quechee, VT 05059-0778 / US | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99956736.5 | 28.10.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999US25286 | Priority number, date | US19980185432 | 03.11.1998 Original published format: US 185432 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0026564 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127234 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127234 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/43 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
F16J15/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/39] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | DREHBEWEGUNGSDURCHFÜHRUNG | [2001/35] | English: | ROTARY MOTION FEEDTHROUGH DEVICE | [2001/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAVERSEE A MOUVEMENT ROTATIF | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 24.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2003 | BE | 24.09.2003 | CH | 24.09.2003 | FI | 24.09.2003 | FR | 24.09.2003 | IT | 24.09.2003 | LI | 24.09.2003 | NL | 24.09.2003 | CY | 28.10.2003 | IE | 28.10.2003 | LU | 28.10.2003 | MC | 31.10.2003 | DK | 24.12.2003 | GR | 24.12.2003 | SE | 24.12.2003 | ES | 04.01.2004 | PT | 24.02.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
FR | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
CY | 28.10.2003 | ||
IE | 28.10.2003 | ||
LU | 28.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
CY | 28.10.2003 | ||
IE | 28.10.2003 | ||
LU | 28.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
CY | 28.10.2003 | ||
LU | 28.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
CY | 28.10.2003 | ||
LU | 28.10.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
CY | 28.10.2003 | ||
LU | 28.10.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
CY | 28.10.2003 | ||
LU | 28.10.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
CY | 28.10.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
NL | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 24.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4995622 (FUSE TOSHIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,5,8,10,13,18,19 * column A; figure - * * column 5, line 30 - line 46 *; | [A]EP0450824 (LORD CORP [US]) [A] 1,5,8,10,13* column 10, line 9 - line 56; figure - *; | [A]US5826885 (HELGELAND WALTER [US]) [A] 1-13,17 * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 19; figure - *; | [XP]WO9917040 (RIGAKU USA INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,5,8,10,13 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 12; figure - *; | [XP]EP0921336 (RIGAKU DENKI CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,5,8,10,13 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 27; figure - * |