EP1206275 - IRRIGATION SOLUTION AND METHOD FOR INHIBITION OF PAIN AND INFLAMMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omeros Corporation 1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2675 Seattle, WA 98101 / US | [2007/36] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Omeros Corporation 1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2675 Seattle, WA 98101 / US | ||
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states OMEROS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC 1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2050 Seattle, WA 98101-2347 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMOPULOS, Gregory, A. 6530 - 83rd Place S.E. Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | 02 /
PALMER, Pamela, P. 601 Carolina Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 03 /
HERZ, Jeffrey, M. 14427 12th Drive S.E. Mill Creek, WA 98012 / US | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Anne Janette, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Merlin House, Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | Taylor, Anne Janette, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Merlin House, Falconry Court Baker's Lane Eppling, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99956954.4 | 05.11.1999 | [2002/21] | WO1999US26330 | Priority number, date | US19980107256P | 05.11.1998 Original published format: US 107256 P | [2002/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0025745 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1206275 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1206275 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61P41/00 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K38/1793 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1793, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/21] | A61K38/17, A61P41/00, // A61K38/17, A61K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/21] | Title | German: | SPÜLLÖSUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHMERZLINDERUNG UND ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMUNG | [2002/21] | English: | IRRIGATION SOLUTION AND METHOD FOR INHIBITION OF PAIN AND INFLAMMATION | [2002/21] | French: | SOLUTION D'IRRIGATION ET METHODE POUR L'INHIBITION DE LA DOULEUR ET DE L'INFLAMMATION | [2002/21] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Request for further processing for: | 03.04.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | 08.03.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.03.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.09.2007 | BE | 05.09.2007 | CH | 05.09.2007 | CY | 05.09.2007 | DK | 05.09.2007 | FI | 05.09.2007 | LI | 05.09.2007 | NL | 05.09.2007 | IE | 05.11.2007 | LU | 05.11.2007 | IT | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | SE | 05.12.2007 | DE | 06.12.2007 | GR | 06.12.2007 | ES | 16.12.2007 | PT | 06.02.2008 | FR | 02.05.2008 | [2011/27] |
Former [2010/06] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
CY | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.11.2007 | ||
LU | 05.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
DE | 06.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
FR | 02.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
DE | 06.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
FR | 02.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
DE | 06.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
FR | 02.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
DE | 06.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
BE | 05.09.2007 | ||
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 05.09.2007 | |
CH | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
LI | 05.09.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9406476 (IMMUNEX CORP [US]) [X] 16,17 * abstract * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 8; claims 1,4-7 * [Y] 1-22; | [XDY]EP0623674 (IMMUNEX CORP [US]) [XD] 16,17 * page 3, line 35 - line 40; claim 15 * [Y] 1-22; | [XY]WO9525795 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 16,17 * abstract * * page 3, line 13 - line 22 * * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 4 * * page 5, line 3 - line 22; claims 1,34 * [Y] 1-22; | [XY]WO9617869 (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT], et al) [X] 16,17 * page 1, line 5 - line 28 * * claims 1,7 * [Y] 1-22; | [A]WO9626738 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [A] 1,2,16,17 * abstract ** page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 14 *; | [Y]WO9721445 (OMEROS MED SYS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * page 5, line 24 - page 9, line 33; claims 1-38 *; | [XY]US5767064 (SIMS JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 16,17 * column 3, line 3 - line 7 * * column 4, line 41 - line 47 * * column 17, line 45 - line 67; claim 1 * [Y] 1-22 |