EP1086415 - SOFTWARE PROTECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER Systèmes 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2001/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SION, Jérôme 27, rue Saint Louis en l'Ile F-75004 Paris / FR | 02 /
LION, Stéphanie 22, rue Jean Guehenno F-35700 Rennes / FR | [2001/13] | Application number, filing date | 99957101.1 | 15.06.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999FR01439 | Priority number, date | FR19980007629 | 17.06.1998 Original published format: FR 9807629 | [2001/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9966388 | Date: | 23.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086415 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086415 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06F21/123 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/346 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,US);
G06F2211/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/13] | Title | German: | SOFTWARESCHUTZSYSTEM | [2001/13] | English: | SOFTWARE PROTECTION SYSTEM | [2001/13] | French: | SYSTEME DE PROTECTION D'UN LOGICIEL | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0191162 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 47 * * column 7, line 15 - line 33 * * column 9, line 51 - column 10, line 13 * * column 10, line 40 - column 12, line 4 * * column 12, line 53 - column 13, line 23 * * claims 12,13 * [A] 3; | [A]US5483597 (STERN JACQUES [FR]) [A] 7 * column A; figures 1,2 * | [Y] - TASHIRO S ET AL, "IMPLEMENTATION OF A SMALL-SCALE PROTOTYPE FOR SOFTWARE SERVICE SYSTEM (SSS)", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN, (1988), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 50 - 61, XP000648481 [Y] 1,6 * the whole document * | [A] - FERREIRA R C, "THE SMART CARD: A HIGH SECURITY TOOL IN EDP", PHILIPS TELECOMMUNICATION REVIEW, (19890901), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 1 - 19, XP000072642 [A] 4,7 * the whole document * |