EP1093663 - INTEGRATED INORGANIC/ORGANIC COMPLEMENTARY THIN-FILM TRANSISTOR CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thin Film Electronics ASA P.O. Box 1872 Vika 0124 Oslo / NO | [2001/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKSON, Thomas 1348 Deerfield Drive State College, PA 16801 / US | 02 /
BONSE, Mathias Apartment 125, 201 Vairo Blvd State College, PA 16803 / US | 03 /
THOMASSON, Daniel, B. 240 Los Alamos Road Santa Rosa, CA 95409 / US | 04 /
HAGEN, Klauk Apartment B, 1670 West College Av. State College, PA 16801 / US | 05 /
GUNDLACH, David J. Apartment Fl, 445 Waupelani Drive State College, PA 16801 / US | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/17] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99957112.8 | 18.06.1999 | [2001/17] | WO1999NO00208 | Priority number, date | US19980089830P | 19.06.1998 Original published format: US 89830 P | NO19980005729 | 08.12.1998 Original published format: NO 985729 | [2001/17] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9966540 | Date: | 23.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1093663 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
H01L27/1214 (EP,US);
H01L29/786 (KR);
H10K19/20 (EP,US);
H01L29/66765 (EP,US);
H01L29/78669 (EP,US);
H10K10/466 (EP,US);
H01L29/78684 (EP,US);
H10K19/10 (EP,US);
H10K85/113 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE ANORGANISCHE/ORGANISCHE KOMPLEMENTÄRE DÜNNFILMTRANSISTORSCHALTUNG | [2001/17] | English: | INTEGRATED INORGANIC/ORGANIC COMPLEMENTARY THIN-FILM TRANSISTOR CIRCUIT | [2001/17] | French: | CIRCUIT A TRANSISTORS COMPLEMENTAIRES INORGANIQUE/ORGANIQUE INTEGRES A COUCHES MINCES | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1999 | Translation filed | 02.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/23] | 30.04.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.05.2007 | 30.04.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5347144 (GARNIER FRANCIS [FR], et al); | [X]US5612228 (SHIEH CHAN-LONG [US], et al); | [Y]US5625199 (BAUMBACH JOERG [US], et al); | [Y]EP0786820 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) |