EP1089703 - SOLID PRODUCT CAPABLE OF BEING HANDLED BASED ON HYDROPHOBIC MINERAL POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TALC DE LUZENAC 09250 Luzenac / FR | [2001/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARSEGUEL, Didier Chemin du Guerrier F-31450 Deyme / FR | 02 /
GOFFINET, Pierre, Charles 22, allée des Petites Garennes F-91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR | 03 /
RIVIERE, Brigitte 69, rue Joachim du Bellay F-86000 Poitiers / FR | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | BARRE LAFORGUE 95, rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Cabinet BARRE LAFORGUE & associés 95, rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 99957144.1 | 21.06.1999 | [2001/15] | WO1999FR01481 | Priority number, date | FR19980007936 | 23.06.1998 Original published format: FR 9807936 | FR19980012307 | 01.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9812307 | [2001/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9966885 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089703 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1089703 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/035, C09C3/12 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
C09C3/12 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (KR);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61Q1/00 (KR);
A61Q1/12 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | HANDHABBARES FESTES PRODUKT AUF BASIS VON HYDROPHOBEM MINERALPULVER | [2001/28] | English: | SOLID PRODUCT CAPABLE OF BEING HANDLED BASED ON HYDROPHOBIC MINERAL POWDER | [2001/15] | French: | PRODUIT SOLIDE MANIPULABLE A BASE DE POUDRE MINERALE HYDROPHOBE | [2001/15] |
Former [2001/15] | HANDHABBARES FESTES PRODUKT AUF BASIS VON HYDROPHOBEN MINERALPULVER | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.2002 | FI | 22.05.2002 | GR | 22.05.2002 | IE | 22.05.2002 | DK | 22.08.2002 | PT | 22.08.2002 | SE | 22.08.2002 | [2004/40] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
IE | 22.05.2002 | ||
DK | 22.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
IE | 22.05.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
IE | 22.05.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
IE | 22.05.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 22.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4804538 (CHEN MEI L [TW]) [X] 1,11 * column W *; | [A]US4837011 (MACCHIO RALPH A [US], et al) [A] 1,11; | [A]US5023075 (MACCHIO RALPH A [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * example 1 *; | [A]EP0587415 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al)[A] 11; | [A]WO9630448 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 11 * example 1 * |