EP1047544 - MOLD HOLDER FOR MOLDS FOR MANUFACTURING BOOTS OR THE LIKE MADE OF PLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Main Group S.p.A. Viale dell'Industria, 65 35129 Padova / IT | [2000/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORENZIN, Lorenzo Via Ugo Foscolo, 13 I-35031 Abano Terme / IT | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99957292.8 | 09.11.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999EP08564 | Priority number, date | IT1998PD00265 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: IT PD980265 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0029204 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047544 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1047544 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29D31/50, B29D31/51 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
B29D35/0018 (EP);
A43B1/0027 (EP);
B29D35/06 (EP);
B29D35/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2002/24] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | FORMHALTER FÜR FORMWERKZEUGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STIEFELN ODER SCHUHEN AUS KUNSTSTOFF | [2000/44] | English: | MOLD HOLDER FOR MOLDS FOR MANUFACTURING BOOTS OR THE LIKE MADE OF PLASTICS | [2000/44] | French: | SUPPORT DE MOULE DESTINE AUX MOULES SERVANT A LA FABRICATION DE BOTTES OU D'ARTICLES SIMILAIRES EN PLASTIQUE | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01280405 ; | [A]FR1476421 (FRIEDRICH STÜBBE) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900131), vol. 014, no. 053, Database accession no. (C - 0683), & JP01280405 A 19891110 (ACHILLES CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |