EP1253390 - WATER JACKET OF ARC FURNACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shinto Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-23, Wakaba-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki-ken / JP | [2007/23] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Shinto Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-23, Wakaba-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHI, Makoto, Nagasaki Koujou, Shinto Kogyo KK 376-10, Einoura, Kururigou, Togitsu-cho Nishi-sonogi-gun, Nagasaki 851-2107 / JP | 02 /
MAESATO, Masao, Iwaki Koujou, Shinto Kogyo KK 1-2, Minamidai 3-chome Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 974-8242 / JP | 03 /
TAKAMI, Tosirou, Iwaki Koujou, Shinto Kogyo KK 1-2, Minamidai 3-chome Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 974-8242 / JP | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99957413.0 | 03.12.1999 | [2002/44] | WO1999JP06806 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0140728 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1253390 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1253390 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F27B3/14, F27D1/12, C23C10/50 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
F27D1/12 (EP,US);
C23C10/48 (EP,US);
F27B3/14 (EP,US);
F27B3/24 (EP,US);
C21C5/5211 (EP,US);
F27D2009/0013 (EP,US);
F27D2009/0032 (EP,US);
F27D2009/004 (EP,US);
F27D2009/0043 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | WASSERMANTEL FÜR EINEN ELEKTROLICHTBOGENOFEN | [2002/44] | English: | WATER JACKET OF ARC FURNACE | [2002/44] | French: | CHEMISE DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR FOUR A ARC | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2002 | Translation filed | 03.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 11.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.07.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.07.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD131380 (ANDRJUSECKIN VLADIMIR I, et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]EP0030298 (POLITECHNIKA SLASKA IM WINCENT [PL]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS5424693B ; | [Y]JPH018947Y ; | [Y]JPH08193257 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) |