EP1137662 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING QUINAPRIL MAGNESIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHERMAN, Bernard Charles 50 Old Colony Road Willowdale Ontario M2L 2K1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states SHERMAN, Bernard Charles 50 Old Colony Road Willowdale, Ontario M2L 2K1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99957805.7 | 07.12.1999 | [2001/40] | WO1999CA01169 | Priority number, date | NZ19980333206 | 08.12.1998 Original published format: NZ 33320698 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0034314 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1137662 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1137662 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/062, A61K38/05, A61P9/12 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
A61K38/05 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/40] | Title | German: | QUINAPRIL MAGNESIUM ENTHALTENDE, PHARMAZEUTISCH WIRKSAME ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2001/40] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING QUINAPRIL MAGNESIUM | [2001/40] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DU QUINAPRIL MAGNESIUM | [2004/05] |
Former [2001/40] | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT QUINAPRIL MAGNESIUM | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 01.07.2002 | Observations by third parties | 17.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2004 | BE | 08.09.2004 | CH | 08.09.2004 | CY | 08.09.2004 | FI | 08.09.2004 | LI | 08.09.2004 | NL | 08.09.2004 | IE | 07.12.2004 | LU | 07.12.2004 | DK | 08.12.2004 | GR | 08.12.2004 | SE | 08.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 08.02.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
CY | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
IE | 07.12.2004 | ||
LU | 07.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
IE | 07.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 08.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4743450 (HARRIS MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 11 - line 34 * * column 3, line 25 - line 39; example -; claim - *; | [A]US5573780 (SHERMAN BERNARD C [CA]) [A] 1-19 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US5690962 (SHERMAN BERNARD CHARLES [CA]) [A] 1-19* example -; claim - *; | [E]WO9962560 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [E] 1,20 * page 6, line 6 - line 14 * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 17; example 3; claim - * |