EP1044123 - SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATICALLY MEASURING/ADJUSTING THE TIRE PRESSURE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING/ADJUSTING THE TIRE PRESSURE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/06] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Hardy Silcherstrasse 3 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE | 02 /
MOELLER, Hubert 38, boulevard Flandrin F-75116 Paris / FR | 03 /
FAYE, Ian Parlerstrasse 14 D-70192 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
VOLLERT, Herbert Oberriexinger Weg 75 D-71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [2001/14] |
Former [2000/42] | 01 /
HAAS, Hardy Silcherstrasse 3 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE | ||
02 /
MOELLER, Hubert 38, boulevard Flandrin F-75116 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
FAYE, Ian Parlerstrasse 14 D-70192 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04 /
VOLLERT, Herbert Körnerstrasse 71 D-74348 Lauffen/Neckar / DE | Application number, filing date | 99957938.6 | 28.10.1999 | [2000/42] | WO1999DE03449 | Priority number, date | DE1998151563 | 09.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851563 | [2000/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0027678 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044123 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1044123 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60S5/04 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
B60S5/02 (EP,US);
B60S5/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2000/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES FAHRZEUG- REIFENDRUCKMESS/- EINSTELLSYSTEM UND FAHRZEUG- REIFENDRUCKMESS/- EINSTELLVERFAHREN | [2000/42] | English: | SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATICALLY MEASURING/ADJUSTING THE TIRE PRESSURE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING/ADJUSTING THE TIRE PRESSURE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2000/42] | French: | SYSTEME AUTOMATIQUE DE MESURE ET D'AJUSTEMENT DE LA PRESSION DE PNEUS DE VEHICULE ET PROCEDE DE MESURE ET D'AJUSTEMENT DE LA PRESSION DE PNEUS DE VEHICULE | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3308080 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,8,14,18 * abstract * * page 9, line 22 - page 12, line 14 *; | [A]WO9403391 (BRAZZELLI GIAN CARLO [IT], et al) [A] 1,18 * abstract ** page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 5 *; | [A]GB2323453 (KING ANDRE ALAN DONALD [GB]) [A] 1,2,4,5,15,16,18 * abstract * * page 9, line 4 - page 10, line 24 * |