EP1135429 - POLYADDITIONS IN AQUEOUS AND NON-AQUEOUS MINI-EMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 2 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Berlin Hofgartenstrasse 2 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTONIETTI, Markus Am Luchgraben 12 D-14558 Bergholz-Rehbrücke / DE | 02 /
LANDFESTER, Katharina Siemensstrasse 19 D-14482 Potsdam / DE | 03 /
TIARKS, Franca Ebereschenallee 56 D-14050 Berlin / DE | 04 /
BECHTHOLD, Nina In der Feldmark 13 D-14476 Golm / DE | 05 /
WILLERT, Mirjam Am Hüllepfuhl 30a D-13589 Berlin / DE | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Dey, Michael, Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99958045.9 | 16.11.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999EP08789 | Priority number, date | DE1998152784 | 16.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19852784 | DE1999134519 | 22.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19934519 | [2001/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0029465 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1135429 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1135429 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/03, C08G18/08, C08G59/00 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
C08G18/3225 (EP,US);
C08F2/24 (EP,US);
C08G18/0866 (EP,US);
C08G59/50 (EP,US);
C08F212/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F212/08, C08F220/1804, C08F220/14, C08F220/281 (US,EP);
C08F212/08, C08F220/1804, C08F222/102 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Title | German: | POLYADDITIONEN IN WÄSSRIGEN UND NICHTWÄSSRIGEN MINIEMULSIONEN | [2001/39] | English: | POLYADDITIONS IN AQUEOUS AND NON-AQUEOUS MINI-EMULSIONS | [2001/39] | French: | POLYADDITIONS DANS LES MINI-EMULSIONS AQUEUSES ET NON AQUEUSES | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 06.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.04.2003 | AT | 16.11.2003 | CY | 16.11.2003 | FI | 16.11.2003 | LU | 16.11.2003 | PT | 16.11.2003 | IE | 17.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/23] | GR | 23.04.2003 | |
AT | 16.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.11.2003 | ||
FI | 16.11.2003 | ||
LU | 16.11.2003 | ||
IE | 17.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 16.11.2003 | |
CY | 16.11.2003 | ||
FI | 16.11.2003 | ||
LU | 16.11.2003 | ||
IE | 17.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2005/03] | CY | 16.11.2003 | |
FI | 16.11.2003 | ||
LU | 16.11.2003 | ||
IE | 17.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CY | 16.11.2003 | |
FI | 16.11.2003 | ||
LU | 16.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | CY | 16.11.2003 | |
FI | 16.11.2003 | ||
LU | 16.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | CY | 16.11.2003 | |
LU | 16.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | CY | 16.11.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4104223 (HOSODA MINORU, et al) [X] 1,4 * column 3, line 13 - column 9, line 2 *; | [X]US4517245 (SPAIN RAYMOND G [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 15 - column 4, line 20 *; | [X]EP0509494 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7 * page 2, line 39 - page 5, line 30; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0568976 (MILES INC [US]) [X] 1,3 * page 2, line 45 - page 8, line 53 *; | [X]EP0685544 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 39; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US5686518 (FONTENOT KEVIN J [US], et al) [X] 1,5-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9841552 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 31 - page 8, line 22; claim - *; | [X] - MOURAN ET AL, "Miniemulsion Polymerization of Methyl Methacrylate with Dodecyl Mercaptan as Cosurfactant", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE. PART A, (1996), vol. 34, pages 1073 - 1081, XP002128608 [X] 1,5-10 * page 1073 - page 1078 * |