EP1135267 - METHOD FOR DECORATIVELY SHAPING A PAINTED SUBSTRATE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANKE, Hilmar Rossinistrasse 11 D-49565 Bramsche / DE | 02 /
SIMMROCK, Hans-Ulrich Rathelbeckstrasse 349 D-40627 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
WEIDENHAMMER, Petra Friedenspromenade 110 D-81827 Münchenn / DE | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99958048.3 | 16.11.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999EP08797 | Priority number, date | DE19981053386 | 19.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19853386 | [2001/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0030869 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1135267 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1135267 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B44F1/14, B44C1/24, G03F7/00 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP);
B44F1/14 (EP,KR);
B44C1/24 (EP);
B82Y40/00 (EP);
G03F7/0002 (EP);
G03F7/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DEKORATIVEN GESTALTUNG EINER LACKIERTEN SUBSTRATOBERFLÄCHE | [2001/39] | English: | METHOD FOR DECORATIVELY SHAPING A PAINTED SUBSTRATE SURFACE | [2001/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN EFFET DECORATIF SUR LA SURFACE PEINTE D'UN SUBSTRAT | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 11.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 05.03.2003 | CY | 16.11.2003 | LU | 16.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | GR | 05.03.2003 | |
CY | 16.11.2003 | ||
LU | 16.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | GR | 05.03.2003 | |
CY | 16.11.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 05.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4978593 (YIN KHIN S [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 34 - line 51 *; | [X]EP0439050 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 9 *; | [X]EP0540455 (GILI PICOY PALMIRA [ES]) [X] 1-4,9 * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 18 *; | [AD]DE19613383 (FLOHR SCHMITT EVELYN [DE]) [AD] 1,9 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 59 *; | [PA]EP0896259 (HSM GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-4,9* column 5, line 3 - line 27 * |