EP1149121 - AQUEOUS MONOCONSTITUENT SYSTEM OF A POLYMER WITH ACETAL OR ALDEHYDE FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2001/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERGE, Christophe 14, Côte d'Harcourt F-27170 Beaumontel / FR | 02 /
BETREMIEUX, Isabelle 14, Côte d'Harcourt F-27170 Beaumontel / FR | 03 /
LOYEN, Karine 155, rue Félix Faure F-76620 Le Havre / FR | 04 /
SOARES, Christophe 148, rue Robert Villoing F-78500 Sartrouville / FR | 05 /
CHARLEUX, Bernadette 13, rue du Lieutenant Heitz F-94300 Vincennes / FR | 06 /
VAIRON, Jean-Pierre 7, rue Alfred Nomblot F-92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Ohresser, François, et al ARKEMA Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Ohresser, François, et al Atofina D.C.R.D./D.P.I. 4, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99958323.0 | 14.12.1999 | [2001/44] | WO1999FR03131 | Priority number, date | FR19980015866 | 16.12.1998 Original published format: FR 9815866 | [2001/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0035979 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1149121 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/28, C09D157/10 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
C09D133/062 (EP,US);
C08F246/00 (EP);
C08L33/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONOFUNKTIONELLES WÄSSRIGES POLYMERSYSTEM MIT ACETAL- ODER ALDEHYDFUNKTION | [2001/44] | English: | AQUEOUS MONOCONSTITUENT SYSTEM OF A POLYMER WITH ACETAL OR ALDEHYDE FUNCTION | [2001/44] | French: | SYSTEME MONOCOMPOSANT AQUEUX D'UN POLYMERE A FONCTION ACETAL OU ALDEHYDE | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 05.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0875543 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 56; claim 1 * |