EP1055097 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING PERPENDICULARITY OF A CYLINDRICAL PART, SUCH AS A NUCLEAR FUEL PELLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES MATIERES NUCLEAIRES 2, rue Paul Dautier 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | [2005/41] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES MATIERES NUCLEAIRES 2, rue Paul Dautier 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCHAND, Michel 3, square Arago F-78330 Fontenay-le-Fleury / FR | 02 /
RICHAUD, Christian Quartier Beauregard F-84290 Cairanne / FR | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/48] | Des Termes, Monique, et al c/o Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99958324.8 | 14.12.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999FR03132 | Priority number, date | FR19980015824 | 15.12.1998 Original published format: FR 9815824 | [2000/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036369 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055097 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055097 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/14, G01B11/02, G01B11/27, G01B11/26 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
G01B11/26 (EP,US);
G21C17/06 (EP,US);
G21C3/62 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | LOTÜBERWACHUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ZYLINDRISCHE OBJEKTE WIE KERNBRENNSTOFFTABLETTEN | [2000/48] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING PERPENDICULARITY OF A CYLINDRICAL PART, SUCH AS A NUCLEAR FUEL PELLET | [2000/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE PERPENDICULARITE D'UNE PIECE CYLINDRIQUE, TELLE QU'UNE PASTILLE DE COMBUSTIBLE NUCLEAIRE | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 13.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3801203 (HYLAND F, et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2644238 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [Y] 5,6,9* page 17 - page 18; figures 7-9 *; | [Y]US5774210 (GWEON DAE-GAB [KR], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6,9 * abstract * * column 4 - column 6; figures 1C,2A,2B,3A,-3H * |