EP1057304 - DATA TRANSMITTING DEVICE AND METHOD IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Hoon Donga Apt. Ga-dong 1110, Daechi 4-dong Kangnam-gu, Seoul 135-284 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Hyun-Seok Chamshiljugong Apt. 1-d., 29-302, Chamshil 1-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul 138-221 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dae-Gyun Kyungnam Apt. 7-dong,No.905, Kaepo-dong Kangnam-gu, Seoul 135-240 / KR | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99958502.9 | 02.12.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999KR00727 | Priority number, date | KR19980053335 | 02.12.1998 Original published format: KR 9853335 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0033515 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1057304 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 08.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/54 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
H04W28/22 (EP);
H04W28/02 (KR);
H04B7/2656 (EP);
H04L69/324 (EP);
H04W76/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN VON DATEN IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2000/49] | English: | DATA TRANSMITTING DEVICE AND METHOD IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2000/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS MOBILES | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 14.08.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9519664 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO9524771 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO9636150 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) |