EP1144936 - LOADING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bofors Defence AB 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGSTRÖM, Sven-Erik Skogsrundan 9A S-691 43 Karlskoga / SE | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Falk, Bengt Saab Bofors Support AB Patents and Trademarks 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Falk, Bengt Saab Bofors Support AB Patents and Trademarks 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | Application number, filing date | 99958606.8 | 15.11.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999SE02078 | Priority number, date | SE19990000152 | 20.01.1999 Original published format: SE 9900152 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043723 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144936 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144936 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F41A9/01, F41A9/38 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
F41A9/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | LADUNGSSYSTEM | [2001/42] | English: | LOADING SYSTEM | [2001/42] | French: | SYSTEME DE CHARGEMENT | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 17.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.04.2004 | CY | 14.04.2004 | DK | 14.07.2004 | GR | 14.07.2004 | SE | 14.07.2004 | PT | 14.09.2004 | IE | 15.11.2004 | LU | 15.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | BE | 14.04.2004 | |
CY | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 15.11.2004 | ||
LU | 15.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 14.04.2004 | |
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 15.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | BE | 14.04.2004 | |
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | BE | 14.04.2004 | |
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | BE | 14.04.2004 | |
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | GR | 14.07.2004 | |
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 14.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]SE397220 (BOFORS AB [SE]); | [A]EP0352584 (WEGMANN & CO [DE]); | [A]DE4205963 (KUKA WEHRTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE4324572 (WEGMANN & CO GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO9607865 (BOFORS AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO9621133 (DENEL PTY LTD [ZA], et al) |