EP1115844 - SEQUENZES OF PUTATIVE PLANT ACYLTRANSFERASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calgene LLC 1920 Fifth Street Davis California 95620 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Calgene LLC 1920 Fifth Street Davis, California 95620 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASSNER, Michael, W. 721 Falcon Avenue Davis, CA 95616 / US | 02 /
EMIG, Robin, A. MAXYGEN - 515 Galveston Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 03 /
RUEZINSKY, Diane, M. 849 Bourn Drive Woodland, CA 95776 / US | 04 /
VAN EENENNAAM, Alison 856 Burr Street Davis, CA 95616 / US | [2001/36] |
Former [2001/29] | 01 /
LASSNER, Michael, W. 721 Falcon Avenue Davis, CA 95616 / US | ||
02 /
EMIG, Robin, A. 901 Sara Court Vacaville, CA 95687 / US | |||
03 /
RUEZINSKY, Diane, M. 849 Bourn Drive Woodland, CA 95776 / US | |||
04 /
VAN EENENNAAM, Alison 856 Burr Street Davis, CA 95616 / US | Representative(s) | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 1150 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 1 1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 99958636.5 | 24.09.1999 | [2001/29] | WO1999US22231 | Priority number, date | US19980101939P | 25.09.1998 Original published format: US 101939 P | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0018889 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1115844 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12N9/54, C12N9/82 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
C12N15/8247 (EP);
C12N9/1029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/29] | Title | German: | SEQUENZEN MÖGLICHER PFLANZLICHER ACETYLTTRANSFERASEN | [2001/29] | English: | SEQUENZES OF PUTATIVE PLANT ACYLTRANSFERASES | [2001/29] | French: | NOUVELLES ACYLTRANSFERASES VEGETALES | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 01.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 08.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]WO9624674 (GENE SHEARS PTY LTD ;SLABAS ANTONI RYSZARD (GB); BROWN ADRIAN PAUL) [Y] 1 * abstract * [X] 9-18,20; | [X] - NORBERG A. ET AL., "Chemical detection of natural peptides by specific structures. Isolation chicken galanin by monitoring for its N-terminal dipeptide, and termination of the amino acid sequence.", FEBS LETT 1991 AUG 19;288(1-2):151-3, XP000916139 [X] 1,9-18,20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(91)81023-2 | [YX] - BROWN A P ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF A CDNA THAT ENCODES A 1-ACYL-SN-GLYCEROL-3- PHOSPHATE ACYLTRANSFERASE FROM LIMNANTHES DOUGLASII", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY,NL,NIJHOFF PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, (19951001), vol. 29, no. 2, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 267 - 278, XP002000905 [Y] 1 * abstract * [X] 9-18,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00043651 | [YX] - ISHIZAKI O ET AL, "CLONING AND NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF COMPLEMENTARY DNA FOR THE PLASTID GLYCEROL-3-PHOSPHATE ACYLTRANSFERASE FROM SQUASH", FEBS (FEDERATION OF EUROPEAN BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETIES) LETTERS 1988, (1988), vol. 238, no. 2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 424 - 430, XP000916289 [Y] 1 * abstract * [X] 9-18,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(88)80525-8 | [YX] - JOHNSON T C ET AL, "NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF ACYL-ACYL CARRIER PROTEIN GLYCEROL-3-PHOSPHATE ACYLTRANSFERASE FROM CUCUMBER", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY (BETHESDA) 1992, (1992), vol. 99, no. 2, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 771 - 772, XP000919121 [Y] 1 * abstract * [X] 9-18,20 | [YX] - LASSNER M W ET AL, "LYSOPHOSPHATIDIC ACID ACYLTRANSFERASE FROM MEADOWFOAM MEDIATES INSERTION OF ERUCIC ACID AT THE SN-2 POSITION OF TRIACYLGLYCEROL INTRANSGENIC RAPESEED OIL", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, (19950101), vol. 109, no. 4, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 1389 - 1394, XP002027767 [Y] 1 * abstract * [X] 9-18,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.109.4.1389 | [XY] - NAGIEC, M. MAREK ET AL, "A suppressor gene that enables Saccharomyces cerevisiae to grow without making sphingolipids encodes a protein that resembles an Escherichia coli fatty acyltransferase", J. BIOL. CHEM. (1993), 268(29), 22156-63, XP000644683 [X] 9-18,20 * abstract * [Y] 1 | [YX] - NISHIDA I. ET AL., "The gene and the RNA for the precursor to the plastid-located glycerol-3-phosphate acyltransferase of Arabidopsis thaliana.", PLANT MOL BIOL 1993 JAN;21(2):267-77, XP000916240 [Y] 1 * abstract * [X] 9-18,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00019943 | [AX] - YOKOI SHUJI ET AL, "Introduction of the cDNA for Arabidopsis glycerol-3-phosphate acyltransferase (GPAT) confers unsaturation of fatty acids and chilling tolerance of photosynthesis on rice.", MOLECULAR BREEDING JUNE, 1998, (199806), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1380-3743, pages 269 - 275, XP000909905 [A] 1 * abstract * [X] 9-18,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1009671231614 |