EP1097344 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DESICCATING AND DEAGGLOMERATING WET, PARTICULATE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecotechnology, Inc. Suite 2L, 6355 Riverside Boulevard Sacramento, CA 95831 / US | [2001/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLAHERTY, John, R./ c/o Maureen Dunn 4616 Wynburn Drive Erie, PA 16508 / US | 02 /
GEHRING, Bradley, P. 210 Galahad Place North Hudson, WI 54106 / US | [2001/24] |
Former [2001/19] | 01 /
FLAHERTY, John, R. 532 Spruce Street 8 Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | ||
02 /
GEHRING, Bradley, P. 210 Galahad Place North Hudson, WI 54106 / US | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99958772.8 | 02.11.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999US26038 | Priority number, date | US19980106927P | 03.11.1998 Original published format: US 106927 P | US19990329980 | 10.06.1999 Original published format: US 329980 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0026593 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097344 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/10 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
F26B17/101 (EP,US);
F26B17/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM TROCKNEN UND DESAGGLOMERIEREN VON NASSEM KÖRNIGEM GUT | [2001/19] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DESICCATING AND DEAGGLOMERATING WET, PARTICULATE MATERIALS | [2001/19] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DESSECHAGE ET DE DESAGREGATION DE MATIERES HUMIDES PARTICULAIRES | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/41] | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.12.2000 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | 27.12.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.12.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   29.01.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2003 | 30.11.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2325080 (STEPHANOFF NICHOLAS N); | [A]GB1041120 (FLUID ENERGY PROC AND EQUIPMEN) [A] 1,6,8,11,20,40,41,43,45,46,53-55 * the whole document *; | [XA]US3339286 (STEPHANOFF NICHOLAS N) [X] 1,6-8 * column W * [A] 53-55; | [A]US3550921 (STEPHANOFF NICHOLAS N) [A] 1,11,17,40,47,53-55 * column W *; | [A]US3802089 (STEPHANOFF N); | [A]US3814316 (STEPHANOFF N); | [X]US3974574 (VAN VLIET EDWARD, et al) [X] 1,6,8,10 * column W *; | [XA]US4226027 (ALBUS JAMES F) [X] 1,6,8,10,11,20 * column W * [A] 2-5,16-18,33,40,41,43-47,53-55; | [A]EP0590909 (BARR DEREK JULIAN [GB]) [A] 1,10,11,19,20,27,40 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9725575 (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR IND AB [SE], et al) |