EP1135710 - LIGHT BEAM MIXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Laser Technologies, Inc. Suite 3, 40 West Easy Street Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONEMAC, Donald, C. 2165 Rudolph Drive Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [2001/39] | Fiener, Josef Maximilianstrasse 57, P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99959073.0 | 22.11.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999US27663 | Priority number, date | US19980200548 | 25.11.1998 Original published format: US 200548 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031578 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1135710 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/10 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
G02B27/00 (KR);
G02B27/143 (EP,US);
G02B27/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTSTRAHL-VERMISCHER | [2001/39] | English: | LIGHT BEAM MIXER | [2001/39] | French: | MELANGEUR DE FAISCEAUX LUMINEUX | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 05.11.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5296958 (RODDY JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]US5175741 (OKAZAKI YOJI [JP]) |