EP1119661 - SHAPED PAVESTONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hans Rinninger u. Sohn GmbH & Co. Stolzenseeweg 9 88353 Kisslegg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Hans Rinninger u. Sohn GmbH u. Co. Betonwarenfabriken Stolzenseestrasse 9 88353 Kisslegg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RINNINGER, Hans, Josef Kirchmoosstrasse 22 D-88353 Kisslegg / DE | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/31] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99959189.4 | 06.10.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999DE03231 | Priority number, date | DE1998146480 | 09.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19846480 | [2001/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0022236 | Date: | 20.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119661 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119661 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E01C5/06 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
E01C5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/31] | Title | German: | FORMSTEIN | [2001/31] | English: | SHAPED PAVESTONE | [2001/31] | French: | PAVE MOULE | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.02.2005 | FR | 23.02.2005 | IE | 23.02.2005 | IT | 23.02.2005 | DK | 23.05.2005 | GR | 23.05.2005 | SE | 23.05.2005 | ES | 03.06.2005 | PT | 03.08.2005 | CY | 06.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
FR | 23.02.2005 | ||
IE | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
CY | 06.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
FR | 23.02.2005 | ||
IE | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
IE | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
IE | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
IE | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
ES | 03.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
SE | 23.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.02.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DY]US4792257 (RINNINGER HANS [DE]) [DY] 1-8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9013618U (GÜLTIG) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0768427 (PAVESMAC S R L [IT]) [Y] 1-8,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3325752 | US4792257 |