EP1135642 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTING CONDUIT SECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAJE, Detlef Paul-Schlesiger-Strasse 13 D-46236 Bottrop / DE | 02 /
SCHOLL, Lothar Luxemburger Allee 43 D-45481 Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE | [2001/39] | Application number, filing date | 99959325.4 | 24.11.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999EP09087 | Priority number, date | EP19980123061 | 09.12.1998 Original published format: EP 98123061 | [2001/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0034707 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1135642 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1135642 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/036, F16L17/06 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
F16L23/00 (EP,US);
F16L23/036 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2003/17] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN VON LEITUNGSABSCHNITTEN | [2001/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONNECTING CONDUIT SECTIONS | [2001/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR RACCORDER DES TRON ONS DE CONDUITE | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1286356 (KERNFORSCHUNG GMBH GES FUER) [A] 1,3,4,11-13 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE2452770 (HOCHTEMPERATUR REAKTORBAU GMBH) [AD] 1,7-13* figures 1-4; claims 1-4 *; | [AD]DE19711580 (BOLIK TORSTEN [DE]) [AD] 1,2,5-10 * the whole document * |