EP1151226 - REFLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABACUS HOLDINGS LIMITED Sutton-in-Ashfield Nottinghamshire NG17 5FT / GB | [2001/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUSTIN, Kelvin John 38 Longridge Road, Woodthorpe Nottingham / GB | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Church, Simon John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Church, Simon John, et al Marks & Clerk 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | ||
Former [2001/45] | Church, Simon John Lewis & Taylor 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99959570.5 | 10.12.1999 | [2001/45] | WO1999GB04169 | Priority number, date | GB19990003182 | 13.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9903182 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0047931 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1151226 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1151226 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/08, F21V7/09, F21S13/10 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
F21S8/088 (EP);
F21V7/09 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/45] | F21S8/08, F21V7/09, // F21W131:103 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/04] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | REFLEKTOR | [2001/45] | English: | REFLECTOR | [2001/45] | French: | REFLECTEUR | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | BE | 24.01.2007 | CH | 24.01.2007 | CY | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | LI | 24.01.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3433941 (HALL WILLIAM B) [A] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US3746854 (BRASS J) [A] 1,2,8,9 * column 5, line 49 - column 7, line 40 ** figures 1,3-6 *; | [A]GB2024397 (ITT) [A] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * page 1, line 108 - page 2, line 57 * * figures 1-5A *; | [A]US4347554 (MATSUSHITA NOBUO) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 58 * * figures 1,8,10 *; | [A]US5816694 (IDEKER BARTON K [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7-9 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 53 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0881425 (BARTENBACH CHRISTIAN [AT]) [A] 1,5-8 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 27 * * figure - * |