EP1056366 - IMPROVEMENT FOR THE DEVICES CONTAINING A PLURALITY OF TOOTHED BLADES OF FLANKED KEYS THAT MAY BE SELECTED AND PULLED OUT ONE BY ONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montanari, Pierluigi Via Alpi Apuane, 44 I-00141 Roma / IT | [2000/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Mascioli, Alessandro Via Leonina, 26 00184 Roma / IT | [2000/49] | Application number, filing date | 99959685.1 | 10.12.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999IT00407 | Priority number, date | IT1998RM00788 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: IT RM980788 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036946 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056366 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1056366 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A45C13/02, A45C11/32 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
A45C11/328 (EP,US);
Y10T70/8676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/49] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN VERZAHNTEN BLÄTTER DIE EINZELN ENTNOMMEN WERDEN KÖNNEN | [2000/49] | English: | IMPROVEMENT FOR THE DEVICES CONTAINING A PLURALITY OF TOOTHED BLADES OF FLANKED KEYS THAT MAY BE SELECTED AND PULLED OUT ONE BY ONE | [2000/49] | French: | AMELIORATION APPORTEE A DES DISPOSITIFS CONTENANT PLUSIEURS LAMES DENTEES DE CLES PLACEES COTE A COTE POUVANT ETRE CHOISIES ET TIREES UNE A UNE | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 01.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.07.2002 | BE | 24.07.2002 | CH | 24.07.2002 | FI | 24.07.2002 | GR | 24.07.2002 | LI | 24.07.2002 | NL | 24.07.2002 | DK | 24.10.2002 | SE | 24.10.2002 | PT | 25.10.2002 | IE | 10.12.2002 | LU | 10.12.2002 | CY | 31.12.2002 | [2012/50] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
BE | 24.07.2002 | ||
CH | 24.07.2002 | ||
FI | 24.07.2002 | ||
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
LI | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 25.10.2002 | ||
IE | 10.12.2002 | ||
LU | 10.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
BE | 24.07.2002 | ||
CH | 24.07.2002 | ||
FI | 24.07.2002 | ||
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
LI | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 25.10.2002 | ||
IE | 10.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
BE | 24.07.2002 | ||
CH | 24.07.2002 | ||
FI | 24.07.2002 | ||
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
LI | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 25.10.2002 | ||
IE | 10.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
BE | 24.07.2002 | ||
CH | 24.07.2002 | ||
FI | 24.07.2002 | ||
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
LI | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 25.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
CH | 24.07.2002 | ||
FI | 24.07.2002 | ||
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
LI | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 25.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
CH | 24.07.2002 | ||
FI | 24.07.2002 | ||
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
LI | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 25.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 24.07.2002 | |
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 25.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 24.07.2002 | |
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 24.07.2002 | |
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | NL | 24.07.2002 | |
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 24.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2694921 (MAX KERNER) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 54; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3147609 (RYAN JOHN W) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-8 *; | [AD]US5232086 (MONTANARI PIERLUIGI [IT]) [AD] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]DE29720170U (RICHTER PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |