EP1055365 - EAR MARKS FOR LIVESTOCK REGISTRATION, PRINTING METHOD FOR EAR MARKS, AND IDENTIFICATION METHOD USING THE EAR MARKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SURGE MIYAWAKI CO., LTD. 19-2, Higashigotanda 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | [2000/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAWAKI, Yutaka 2-7-11-401, Akazutsumi Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 156-0044 / JP | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Rapp, Bertram Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Rapp, Bertram Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/48] | Rapp, Bertram, Dr. Charrier Rapp & Liebau, Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99959736.2 | 09.12.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999JP06927 | Priority number, date | JP19980350531 | 09.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35053198 | JP19990039974 | 18.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3997499 | [2000/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0033648 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055365 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055365 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01K11/00, A01K29/00 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
A01K11/004 (EP,US);
A01K11/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | OHRENMARKEN ZUR VIEHREGISTRIERUNG, DRUCKVERFAHREN FÜR OHRENMARKEN UND IDENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DIESER OHRENMARKEN | [2000/48] | English: | EAR MARKS FOR LIVESTOCK REGISTRATION, PRINTING METHOD FOR EAR MARKS, AND IDENTIFICATION METHOD USING THE EAR MARKS | [2000/48] | French: | MARQUES DISTINCTIVES SERVANT A IDENTIFIER DU BETAIL, LEUR PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION ET LEUR PROCEDE DE MISE EN APPLICATION | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2000 | Translation filed | 11.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 15.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 01.10.2003 | CY | 09.12.2003 | LU | 09.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | GR | 01.01.2004 | SE | 01.01.2004 | PT | 01.03.2004 | [2019/12] |
Former [2018/28] | ES | 01.10.2003 | |
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
CY | 09.12.2003 | ||
LU | 09.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
PT | 01.03.2004 | ||
Former [2008/18] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
CY | 09.12.2003 | ||
LU | 09.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
PT | 01.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
CY | 09.12.2003 | ||
LU | 09.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
CY | 09.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
CY | 09.12.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 01.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3346980 (WALLACE JOHN W); | [A]FR2762425 (CHEVILLOT SA [FR]) [A] 1,13-16 * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPS58179421 (SANWA TOREEDEINGU KK); | [Y]EP0095930 (ALLFLEX INT [NZ]); | [Y]JPS6036069U ; | [Y]EP0296256 (DAMMANN & WESTERKAMP [DE]); | [Y]JPH085379 (ARAI KK) |