EP1177725 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING GELLING PROPERTIES OF PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Director of National Food Research Institute, Ministry of Agriculture, Forestry and Fisheries 2-1-2 Kannondai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | For all designated states SAN-EI GEN F.F.I., INC. 1-1-11, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka Osaka 561-8588 / JP | For all designated states Tada, Mikiro 1-3-1-102, Tushimanaka Okayama-shi Okayama 700-0082 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Director of National Food Research Institute, Ministry of Agriculture, Forestry and Fisheries 2-1-2 Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | ||
For all designated states SAN-EI GEN F.F.I., INC. 1-1-11, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka, Osaka 561-8588 / JP | |||
For all designated states Tada, Mikiro 1-3-1-102, Tushimanaka Okayama-shi, Okayama 700-0082 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADA, Mikiro 1-3-1-102, Tushimanaka Okayama-shi, Okayama 700-0082 / JP | 02 /
SAKAUE, Kazushi 5-14-12, Higashitokiwadai, Toyonomachi Toyono-gun, Osaka 563-0103 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Toru 1-8-8 Sakuradai Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1217 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Setsuko 4-10-1-904-301 Namiki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0044 / JP | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Goulard, Sophie Cabinet ORES 36 Rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Goulard, Sophie Cabinet Ores, 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99959740.4 | 09.12.1999 | [2002/06] | WO1999JP06931 | Priority number, date | JP19990041594 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4159499 | [2002/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0048472 | Date: | 24.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177725 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23J3/00 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
A23J3/08 (EP,US);
A23J3/00 (EP,US);
A23J3/06 (EP,US);
A23J3/12 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/228 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [2002/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER GELIERUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN EINES PROTEINS | [2002/06] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING GELLING PROPERTIES OF PROTEIN | [2002/06] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LES PROPRIETES GELIFIANTES D'UNE PROTEINE | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2001 | Translation filed | 29.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 09.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH0339033 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD); | [X]JPH0716085 (SAN EI GEN FFI INC); | [X]JPH06327447 (SAN EI GEN FFI INC) |