EP1045439 - DEVICE FOR PROCESSING WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toho Kasei Ltd. 6-2, Imakokubu-cho Yamatokouriyama-shi Nara 639-1031 / JP | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2008/36] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states Toho Kasei Ltd. 6-2, Imakokubu-cho Yamatokouriyama-shi, Nara 639-1031 / JP | ||
For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Norio 6-2, Imakokubu-cho Yamatokouriyama-shi Nara 639-1031 / JP | 02 /
OONO, Masao Kanaoka Koujou Sakai Seisakusho 1304 Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8022 / JP | 03 /
AIHARA, Hiroshi Kanaoka Koujou Sakai Seisakusho 1304 Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8022 / JP | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d 81545 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/42] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99959795.8 | 13.12.1999 | [2000/42] | WO1999JP06998 | Priority number, date | JP19980352593 | 11.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35259398 | [2000/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036644 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045439 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045439 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/68, H01L21/304, B65G49/04, B65G49/07 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
H01L21/67057 (EP,US);
H01L21/68 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/42] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2000/42] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROCESSING WAFER | [2000/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE PLAQUETTES | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2000 | Translation filed | 10.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 10.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 10.08.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.09.2008 | BE | 03.09.2008 | CY | 03.09.2008 | DK | 03.09.2008 | FI | 03.09.2008 | IT | 03.09.2008 | NL | 03.09.2008 | SE | 03.12.2008 | GR | 04.12.2008 | IE | 13.12.2008 | LU | 13.12.2008 | ES | 14.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | FR | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | PT | 03.02.2009 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/44] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CY | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 13.12.2008 | ||
LU | 13.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 13.12.2008 | ||
LU | 13.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 13.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 13.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 03.09.2008 | |
ES | 14.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4040131 (SEMAX GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [DXY]JPH08141526 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [DX] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]JPH1022256 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [Y] 3* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0246727 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH0345636U ; | [X]JPH04349626 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JPH0536668 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH08141526 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG); | [A]JPH1022256 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD); | [AP]JPH11211345 (KAIJO KK); | [AP]JPH11307504 (DAN KAGAKU KK); | [AE]JPH11345798 (DAIKIN IND LTD) |