EP1059494 - REFRIGERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2006/20] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Isao Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
UENO, Akitoshi Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 03 /
MEZAKI, Takenori Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99959811.3 | 14.12.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999JP07025 | Priority number, date | JP19980369514 | 25.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36951498 | [2000/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039510 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059494 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059494 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.07.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F25B7/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F25B7/00 (EP,US);
F25B2313/005 (EP,US);
F25B2313/023 (EP,US);
F25B2400/06 (EP,US);
F25B2400/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KÄLTEEINRICHTUNG | [2000/50] | English: | REFRIGERATING DEVICE | [2000/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REFRIGERATION | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2000 | Translation filed | 17.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5607013 (INOUE YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 51; figures 1,4,5 * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 63 *; | [A]EP0747643 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH02122141 ; | [X]JPH09138046 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900730), vol. 014, no. 351, Database accession no. (M - 1003), & JP02122141 A 19900509 (MATSUSHITA REFRIG CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09138046 A 19970527 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 6,7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4878357 (SEKIGAMI KUNIE [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH03111870U ; | [Y]JPS5866762 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH10103800 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPS58178159 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH09138046 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) |