EP1142587 - REMEDIES FOR PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Meiji Seika Kaisha, Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyama, Yoshihisa, Pharm. Res. Ctr. Meiji Seika K., Ltd., 760 Morooka-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 02 /
Kudoi, Toshiaki, Pharm. Res. Ctr. Meiji Seika K., Ltd., 760 Morooka-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 03 /
Mori, Tomohisa, Pharm. Res. Ctr. Meiji Seika K., Ltd., 760 Morooka-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 04 /
Asai, Kenji, Pharm. Res. Ctr. MeijiSeika K., Ltd. , 760 Morooka-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 05 /
Miike, Naoko, Pharm. Res. Ctr. Meiji Seika K., Ltd., 760 Morooka-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 06 /
Yanagisawa, Yumiko, Pharm. Res. Ctr. Meiji Seika K., Ltd., 760 Morooka-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokoham-shi, KKanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 07 /
Watanabe, Takashi, Pharm. Res. Ctr. Meiji Seika K., Ltd., 760 Morooka-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 08 /
Tsushima, Masaki, Pharm. Res. Ctr. Meiji Seika K., Ltd., 760 Morooka-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 09 /
Hiranuma, Toyokazu, Pharm. Res. Ctr. Meiji Seika K., Ltd., 760 Morooka-cho, Kohoku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Hall, Marina Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Hall, Marina Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99959951.7 | 21.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999JP07191 | Priority number, date | JP19980367366 | 24.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36736698 | JP19990136812 | 18.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13681299 | [2001/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0038720 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142587 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K31/438, A61K31/4409, C07D401/14, C07D401/04, A61P25/04, C07D491/107, C07D471/10 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/438 (EP);
A61K31/444 (EP);
A61K31/454 (EP);
A61K31/4709 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP);
C07D471/10 (EP);
C07D491/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIEN GEGEN SCHMERZ | [2001/41] | English: | REMEDIES FOR PAIN | [2001/41] | French: | REMEDES CONTRE LA DOULEUR | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2001 | Translation filed | 18.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 30.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - SWAIN HENRY, "Annual Report: evaluation of new compounds for opioid activity", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1980), vol. 93, Database accession no. 107010A, XP002924328 | [ ] - NIDA RES. MONOGR.,(PROB. DRUG DEPEND.), (1979), vol. 27, pages 356 - 398 | [X] - RAFAEL MALDONADO, "Absence of opiate rewarding effects in mice lacking dopamine D2 receptors", NATURE, (1997), vol. 388, no. 6642, pages 586 - 589, XP002924329 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/41567 | [X] - JOSEE E. LEYSEN, "(3H)Sufentanil, a Superior Ligand for mu-Opiate receptors: Binding Properties and Regional Distribution in Rat Brain and Spinal Cord", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1983), vol. 87, no. 2-3, pages 209 - 225, XP002924330 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(83)90331-X |