EP1141608 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN ARRANGEMENT FOR CONNECTING DOUBLE-SHELLED PLASTIC PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/41] | AN ARRANGEMENT FOR CONNECTING DOUBLE-SHELLED PLASTIC PIPES | ||
[2004/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pipelife Norge AS 6650 Surnadal 1566 Surnadal / NO | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUTE, Kurt, Per Langnesveien 16 N-7125 Vanvikan / NO | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99960053.9 | 15.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999NO00381 | Priority number, date | NO19980005948 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: NO 985948 | [2001/41] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036325 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141608 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141608 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/00, F16L47/02 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
F16L21/03 (EP);
F16L25/0036 (EP);
F16L47/02 (EP);
B29C65/0672 (EP);
B29C66/30223 (EP);
B29C66/5344 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/30223, B29C65/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER ANORDNUNG ZUR VERBINDUNG VON DOPPELWANDIGEN KUNSTSTOFFROHREN | [2004/13] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN ARRANGEMENT FOR CONNECTING DOUBLE-SHELLED PLASTIC PIPES | [2004/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ARRANGEMENT POUR LE RACCORDEMENT DE TUYAUX EN PLASTIQUE A DOUBLE PAROI | [2004/13] |
Former [2001/41] | ANORDNUNG ZUR VERBINDUNG VON DOPPELWANDIGEN KUNSTSTOFFROHREN | ||
Former [2001/41] | AN ARRANGEMENT FOR CONNECTING DOUBLE-SHELLED PLASTIC PIPES | ||
Former [2001/41] | ARRANGEMENT POUR LE RACCORDEMENT DE TUYAUX EN PLASTIQUE A DOUBLE PAROI | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.1999 | Translation filed | 18.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 18.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.10.2004 | CH | 13.10.2004 | CY | 13.10.2004 | FR | 13.10.2004 | IT | 13.10.2004 | LI | 13.10.2004 | LU | 15.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | GR | 13.01.2005 | ES | 24.01.2005 | PT | 13.03.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | BE | 13.10.2004 | |
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
CY | 13.10.2004 | ||
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LU | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | BE | 13.10.2004 | |
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 13.10.2004 | |
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0385465 (OLTMANNS KUNSTSTOFFWERK GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5071173 (HEGLER WILHELM [DE], et al); | [A]DE4432199 (HEGLER WILHELM [DE]); | [A]EP0789176 (HEGLER RALPH PETER DR ING [DE]) |