EP1107852 - MOMENT CONTROL UNIT FOR SPACECRAFT ATTITUDE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states Honeywell Inc. 101 Columbia Road, AB-2B, PO Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Lawrence, P. 1120 West Aster Drive Phoenix, AZ 85029 / US | 02 /
HYDE, Tristam, T. 7822 North 8th Street Phoenix, AZ 85020 / US | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/51] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/25] | Sturm, Christoph Honeywell AG, Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 99960101.6 | 05.08.1999 | [2001/25] | WO1999US17764 | Priority number, date | US19980139989 | 26.08.1998 Original published format: US 139989 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0012269 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1107852 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1107852 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/28, G05D1/08 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
B64G1/286 (EP,US);
B64G1/244 (EP,US);
B64G1/283 (EP,US);
B64G1/285 (EP,US);
B64G1/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/25] | B25J5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/03] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | DRALLREGELUNGSEINHEIT FÜR RAUMFAHRZEUGLAGEREGELUNG | [2001/25] | English: | MOMENT CONTROL UNIT FOR SPACECRAFT ATTITUDE CONTROL | [2001/25] | French: | UNITE DE REGULATION A INERTIE POUR CONTROLER L'ATTITUDE D'UN ASTRONEF | [2001/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 07.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4825716 (ROBERTS RANDY D [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0539930 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 36 * * column 6, line 8 - line 13 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO8911632 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 22 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 25 * * figures 1,8 *; | [A]US3452948 (KUKEL JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 22 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3439548 (HORVATH TIBOR) [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * * column 1, line 23 - line 35 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3,6,7 *; | [A]US4071211 (MUHLFELDER LUDWIG, et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * column 8, line 21 - line 31 * * figure 4 * |