EP1097087 - RESEALABLE LID FOR BEVERAGE CANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schley, Alexander Hallstadter Strasse 111 96052 Bamberg / DE | [2001/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Barske, Heiko, et al Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Barske, Heiko, Dr. rer. nat., et al Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99960677.5 | 12.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999DE02121 | Priority number, date | DE1998212116U | 10.07.1998 Original published format: DE 29812116 U | [2001/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002785 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097087 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097087 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D17/34 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
B65D17/4014 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0025 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0043 (EP,US);
Y10S220/906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Title | German: | WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARER GETRÄNKEDOSENDECKEL | [2001/19] | English: | RESEALABLE LID FOR BEVERAGE CANS | [2001/19] | French: | COUVERCLE DE BOITE-BOISSON POUVANT ETRE REFERME | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.10.2002 | GR | 09.10.2002 | NL | 09.10.2002 | DK | 09.01.2003 | PT | 09.01.2003 | [2007/23] |
Former [2003/43] | FI | 09.10.2002 | |
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 09.10.2002 | |
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 09.10.2002 | |
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 09.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE9005150U (L.WILDHIRT) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [PA]DE19750783 (REICHOW JENS DIPL KRISTALLOGRA [DE], et al) [PA] 1* figure - *; | [PA]DE29803271U (ROOB JOSEF DIPL ING FH [DE], et al) [PA] 1 * figure 3 * |