EP1135650 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A STEAM GENERATOR AND STEAM GENERATOR FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUMMEL, Hans-Gerd Naturbadstrasse 27 D-91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
BÄHR, Siegfried Am Oberen Tor 14 D-91330 Eggolsheim / DE | 03 /
REISSIG, Sergej Schwedlerstrasse 33 D-91058 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
KIRSTEIN, Kurt Ernest Nussbaum-Strasse 2 2100 Leobendorf / AT | [2001/43] |
Former [2001/39] | 01 /
BRUMMEL, Hans-Gerd Naturbadstrasse 27 D-91056 Erlangen / DE | ||
02 /
BÄHR, Siegfried Am Oberen Tor 14 D-91330 Eggolsheim / DE | |||
03 /
REISSIG, Sergej Schwedlerstrasse 33 D-91058 Erlangen / DE | |||
04 /
KIRSTEIN, Kurt Sandstrasse 2 D-91099 Poxdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99960910.0 | 17.11.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999DE03654 | Priority number, date | DE1998155670 | 02.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19855670 | [2001/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0032987 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1135650 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F22B35/00, F23L15/00 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
F22B35/00 (EP);
F22B35/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES DAMPFERZEUGERS UND DAMPFERZEUGER ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2001/39] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A STEAM GENERATOR AND STEAM GENERATOR FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD | [2001/39] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR, ET GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE LEDIT PROCEDE | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/22] | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB904536 (MINI OF MINES & TECHNICAL SURV) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]US4969408 (ARCHER DAVID H [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, paragraph 2 * * column 4, line 29 - line 54; figure - *; | [A]US3877440 (WINKIN JUSTIN P) [A] 1 * column A * * column 3, line 40 - line 62; figure - * | by applicant | DE3712801 |