EP1141262 - SUBTILASE ENZYMES OF THE I-S2 SUB-GROUP HAVING AN ADDITIONAL AMINO ACID RESIDUE IN AN ACTIVE SITE LOOP REGION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/41] | SUBTILASE ENZYMES OF THE I-S1 AND I-S2 SUB-GROUPS HAVING AN ADDITIONAL AMINO ACID RESIDUE IN AN ACTIVE SITE LOOP REGION | ||
[2008/43] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2012/39] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN VILBOUR, Kim Karlstad Allé 7 DK-2700 Bronshoj / DK | 02 /
MIKKELSEN, Frank Bykildevej 5 ST.TV DK-2500 Valby / DK | 03 /
HANSEN KAMP, Peter Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 04 /
ANDERSEN, Carsten Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 05 /
NORREGAARD-MADSEN, Mads Ellebakken 5 DK-3460 Birkerod / DK | [2012/39] |
Former [2001/50] | 01 /
ANDERSEN VILBOUR, Kim Karlstad Allé 7 DK-2700 Bronshoj / DK | ||
02 /
MIKKELSEN, Frank Bykildevej 5 ST.TV DK-2500 Valby / DK | |||
03 /
HANSEN KAMP, Peter Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
04 /
ANDERSEN, Carsten Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
05 /
NORREGAARD-MADSEN, Mads Ellebakken 5 DK-3460 Birkerod / DK | |||
Former [2001/47] | 01 /
ANDERSEN VILBOUR, Kim Karlstad Allé 7 DK-2700 Bronshoj / DK | ||
02 /
MIKKELSEN, Frank Bykildevej 5 ST.TV DK-2500 Valby / DK | |||
03 /
HANSEN KAMP, Peter Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
04 /
ANDERSEN, Carsten Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
05 /
NORREGAARD-MADSEN, Mads Munkerisvej 31 2.TV. DK-5230 Odense M. / DK | |||
Former [2001/44] | 01 /
ANDERSEN VILBOUR, Kim T singegade 31 4.th. DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | ||
02 /
MIKKELSEN, Frank Bykildevej 5 ST.TV DK-2500 Valby / DK | |||
03 /
HANSEN KAMP, Peter Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
04 /
ANDERSEN, Carsten Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
05 /
NORREGAARD-MADSEN, Mads Munkerisvej 31 2.TV. DK-5230 Odense M. / DK | |||
Former [2001/42] | 01 /
ANDERSEN VILBOUR, Kim T singegade 31 4.th. DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | ||
02 /
MIKKELSEN, Frank Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
03 /
HANSEN KAMP, Peter Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
04 /
ANDERSEN, Carsten Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
05 /
NORREGAARD-MADSEN, Mads Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
ANDERSEN VILBOUR, Kim T singegade 31 4.th. DK-2100 Copenhagen . / DK | ||
02 /
MIKKELSEN, Frank Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
03 /
HANSEN KAMP, Peter Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
04 /
ANDERSEN, Carsten Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
05 /
N RREGAARD-MADSEN, Mads Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Representative(s) | Rasmussen, Preben, et al Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Rasmussen, Preben, et al Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [2010/28] | Wright, Andrew John, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99960948.0 | 20.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999DK00718 | Priority number, date | DK19160007098 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: DK 167098 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0037627 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141262 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141262 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1141262 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/54 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
C11D3/386 (EP);
C12N9/54 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2001/41] | C12N9/54, // C11D3:386 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | SUBTILASE ENZYME DER I-S2 UNTERGRUPPE, MIT EINEM ZUSÄTZLICHEN AMINOSÄURENREST IN EINER AKTIVEN SCHLEIFENREGION | [2008/43] | English: | SUBTILASE ENZYMES OF THE I-S2 SUB-GROUP HAVING AN ADDITIONAL AMINO ACID RESIDUE IN AN ACTIVE SITE LOOP REGION | [2008/43] | French: | ENZYMES SUBTILASES DES SOUS-GROUPE I-S2 AYANT UN RESIDU D'ACIDE AMINE ADDITIONNEL DANS UNE REGION BOUCLE DE SITE ACTIF | [2008/43] |
Former [2001/41] | SUBTILASE ENZYME DER I-S1 UND I-S2 UNTERGRUPPEN, MIT EINEM ZUSÄTZLICHEN AMINOSÄURENREST IN EINER AKTIVEN SCHLEIFENREGION | ||
Former [2001/41] | SUBTILASE ENZYMES OF THE I-S1 AND I-S2 SUB-GROUPS HAVING AN ADDITIONAL AMINO ACID RESIDUE IN AN ACTIVE SITE LOOP REGION | ||
Former [2001/41] | ENZYMES SUBTILASES DES SOUS-GROUPES I-S1 ET I-S2 AYANT UN RESIDU D'ACIDE AMINE ADDITIONNEL DANS UNE REGION BOUCLE DE SITE ACTIF | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.01.2010
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA FJP Patentabteilung Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2010/08] | 19.02.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.08.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.09.2010 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.12.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.03.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.08.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 07.02.2012 | Appeal received No. T0287/12 | 28.03.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.2009 | CY | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | IT | 15.04.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | ES | 26.07.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | IE | 20.12.2009 | LU | 20.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | MC | 01.07.2010 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
IT | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
IE | 20.12.2009 | ||
LU | 20.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0405901 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [A]WO9530011 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]WO9628566 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]WO9820115 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [A]WO9855634 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [XP]WO9927082 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) | by applicant | EP0405901 |