EP1143867 - BONE FIXATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolter, Dietmar, Prof. Dr. c/o Berufsgenossenschaftliches Unfallkrankenhaus Bergedorfer Strasse 10 D-21033 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Wolter, Dietmar, Prof. Dr. c/o Berufsgenossenschaftliches Unfallkrankenhaus, Bergedorfer Strasse 10 D-21033 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Siemons, Norbert, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Siemons, Norbert, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/42] | Siemons, Norbert, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, et al Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99960994.4 | 24.11.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999EP09065 | Priority number, date | DE1998158889 | 19.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858889 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036984 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143867 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143867 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/58, A61B17/72 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
A61B17/7225 (EP,US);
A61B17/72 (EP,US);
A61B17/725 (EP,US);
A61B17/7258 (EP,US);
A61B17/8057 (EP,US);
A61B17/8014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FIXATIONSSYSTEM FÜR KNOCHEN | [2001/42] | English: | BONE FIXATION SYSTEM | [2001/42] | French: | SYSTEME DE FIXATION POUR OS | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 31.10.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 31.07.2002 | GR | 31.07.2002 | IE | 31.07.2002 | NL | 31.07.2002 | DK | 31.10.2002 | SE | 31.10.2002 | PT | 18.11.2002 | LU | 24.11.2002 | BE | 30.11.2002 | CY | 30.11.2002 | [2005/21] |
Former [2004/39] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
IE | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
LU | 24.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
IE | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
IE | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
IE | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 18.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | NL | 31.07.2002 | |
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 31.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4343117 (WOLTER DIETMAR [DE]) [A] 1-25 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 29 *; | [A]US5534032 (HODOREK ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1,3,4,7,9,10,12-15,18,22 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 40 *; | [A]WO9709000 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,8-11,14-18,22,24 * page 3, lines 4-11 *; | [A]DE19629011 (WOLTER DIETMAR PROF DR MED [DE]) [A] 25-36* column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 43 *; | [A]US5810823 (KLAUE KAJ [DE], et al) [A] 1-24 * figures 5-7 * |