EP1140305 - ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEM AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATANI, Masayuki, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr. D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99961473.8 | 28.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999JP07400 | Priority number, date | JP19990005544 | 12.01.1999 Original published format: JP 554499 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0041788 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140305 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/12 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
A63F13/323 (EP,KR);
A63F13/21 (KR);
A63F13/285 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/92 (US);
A63F2300/1037 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/403 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | UNTERHALTUNGSSYSTEM UND AUFZEICHUNGSMEDIUM | [2001/41] | English: | ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEM AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2001/41] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIVERTISSEMENT ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 01.03.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10295932 ; | [A]JPH10295937 ; | [A]US5558577 (KATO SHUHEI [JP]) [A] 4,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5591104 (ANDRUS BRYAN D [US], et al) [A] 4,12 * column 3, line 25 - line 31 * * column 3, line 56 - line 66 *; | [A]DE29810019U (SCHMIDTS RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 5,13* figure 1 *; | [A]WO9848377 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP], et al) [A] 1,9; | [PA]EP0933724 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [PA] 1,9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10295932 A 19981110 (KYUSHU HITACHI MAXELL LTD) [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10295937 A 19981110 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT:KK) [A] 1,9 * abstract * |