EP1159245 - SYNTHESIS OF 4-KETOCYCLOPENTENE AND CYCLOPENTADIENE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2002 [2002/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHANKAR, Ravi, B. 4300 Congress Drive Midland, MI 48642 / US | 02 /
TIMMERS, Francis, J. 4605 Lund Drive Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99961708.7 | 19.11.1999 | [2001/49] | WO1999US27395 | Priority number, date | US19990122614P | 03.03.1999 Original published format: US 122614 P | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0051958 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159245 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/67, C07C49/665, C07C13/66, C07F7/10 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
C07F7/10 (EP,US);
C07C17/093 (EP,US);
C07C23/18 (EP,US);
C07C29/143 (EP,US);
C07C303/28 (EP,US);
C07C45/676 (EP,US);
C07C46/04 (EP,US);
C07C49/665 (EP,US);
C07C49/683 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/093, C07C23/18 (EP,US);
C07C29/143, C07C35/44 (US,EP);
C07C303/28, C07C309/66 (US,EP);
C07C46/04, C07C50/16 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON 4-KETOCYCLOPENTEN UND CYCLOPENTADIENVERBINDUNGEN | [2001/49] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF 4-KETOCYCLOPENTENE AND CYCLOPENTADIENE COMPOUNDS | [2001/49] | French: | SYNTHESE DE COMPOSES 4-CETOCYCLOPENTENES ET CYCLOPENTADIENES | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 22.11.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2656390 (MAX STOLL) [Y] 1-7 * claim - *; | [PA]WO9914221 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [PA] 7 * example 1 *; | [PA]WO9940096 (BOULDER SCIENT CO [US], et al) [PA] 7* page 2; claim - *; | [Y] - COPE ARTHUR C ET AL, "The condensation product of 9,10-phenanthrenequinone and ethyl acetoacetate", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (1958), vol. 80, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5513 - 5516, XP002130061 [Y] 1-7 * page 5514 - page 5515 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01553a050 | [Y] - COPE ARTHUR C ET AL, "The rearrangement of allyl groups in three-carbon systems. VI. Benzene and phenanthrene derivatives", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (1956), vol. 78, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2547 - 2551, XP002130062 [Y] 1-7 * pages 2548, 2550, 2551 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01592a059 | [Y] - COOPER R M ET AL, "Acetolysis of 2-(2,3-dihydro-1H-cyclopenta[1]phenanthren-2-yl)ethyl derivatives: participation by the 9,10-bond of phenanthrene to give an analog of a classical norbornyl cation", J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 2 (JCPKBH);1972; (5); PP.594-8, King's Coll.;Dep. Chem.; London; Engl., XP002130063 [Y] 1-7 * page 596, column 2 - page 597, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p29720000594 |