EP1133480 - QUINOLINE AND QUINOXALINE COMPOUNDS AS PDGF-RECEPTOR AND/OR LCK TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Somerset Corporate Boulevard Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Somerset Corporate Boulevard Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. Route 202-206, P.O. Box 6800, Mail Code: EMC-G1 Bridgewater, NJ 08807-0800 / US | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Products Inc. Route 202-206, P.O. Box 6800, Mail Code: EMC-G1 Bridgewater, NJ 08807-0800 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYERS, Michael, R. 3 allée du Prieuré F-78860 St. Nom La Breteche / FR | 02 /
HE, Wei 1005 Bayberry Lane Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 03 /
SPADA, Alfred, P. 473 Painter Way Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 04 /
MAGUIRE, Martin P., Apartment 507 169 Monsignor O'Brien Highway Cambridge, MA 01801 / US | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Jones, Stephen Anthony AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | [2009/30] |
Former [2001/38] | Jones, Stephen Anthony AdamsonJones Broadway Business Centre 32a Stoney Street Nottingham NG1 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99961784.8 | 23.11.1999 | [2001/38] | WO1999US27825 | Priority number, date | US19980198718 | 24.11.1998 Original published format: US 198718 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031051 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133480 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/44, A61K31/50, C07D215/20, C07D215/38, C07D405/12, C07D241/42, C07D453/06 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
C07D215/38 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D215/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D241/42 (EP,KR,US);
C07D241/44 (EP,KR,US);
C07D241/52 (EP,KR,US);
C07D241/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHINOLIN UND CHINOXALIN VERBINDUNGEN ALS PDGF-REZEPTOR UND/ODER LCK TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITOREN | [2001/38] | English: | QUINOLINE AND QUINOXALINE COMPOUNDS AS PDGF-RECEPTOR AND/OR LCK TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITORS | [2001/38] | French: | COMPOSES DE QUINOLEINE ET QUINOXALINE UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DU RECEPTEUR PDGF ET/OU DE LA TYROSINE KINASE LCK | [2001/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 21.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2005 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 10.10.2005 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2913728 (BAYER AG) [X] 1 * page 11,12,20,23,24 *; | [A]US5409930 (SPADA ALFRED P [US], et al) [A] 1,86,87 * column 1 - column 8; claim - *; | [A]US5480883 (SPADA ALFRED P [US], et al) [A] 1,86,87 * claim - *; | [X]WO9803305 (SPEEDFAM CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 93 - page 94 *; | [PX]WO9854157 (RHONE POULENC RORER PHARMA [US], et al) [PX] 1,86,87 * complete document *; | [PX]WO9854158 (RHONE POULENC RORER PHARMA [US], et al) [PX] 1,86,87* complete document *; | [DX] - MARTIN P. MAGUIRE ET AL., "A new series of PDGF receptor tyrosine kinase inhibitors: 3-substituted quinoline derivatives", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., US, vol. 37, no. 14, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2129 - 2137, XP002133783 [DX] 1,86,87 * page 2131, 2135 and 2136: compounds 17n, 26 and 27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00045a004 |