EP1135527 - CLONING AND COPYING ON SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noxxon Pharma AG Gustav-Meyer-Allee 25 13355 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Von Kiedrowski, Günter Steilstrasse 6c 44797 Bochum-Stiepel / DE | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON KIEDROWSKI, Günter Steilstrasse 6c D-44797 Bochum / DE | 02 /
FÜRSTE, Jens, Peter Huberweg 14 D-13559 Berlin / DE | 03 /
KLUSSMANN, Sven Paulsborner Strasse 83 A D-10709 Berlin / DE | 04 /
KLEIN, Thomas Phillipp-Franck-Weg 9 D-14109 Berlin / DE | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Omsels, Hermann-Josef Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Omsels, Hermann-Josef HERTIN Anwaltssozietät Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99962118.8 | 26.11.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999DE03856 | Priority number, date | DE19981054946 | 27.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19854946 | [2001/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0032809 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1135527 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1135527 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, B01J19/00 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
C12N15/10 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (EP,US);
Y10S977/902 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/686, C12Q2565/543, C12Q2565/515, C12Q2565/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Extension states | AL | 12.05.2001 | LT | 12.05.2001 | LV | 12.05.2001 | MK | 12.05.2001 | RO | 12.05.2001 | SI | 12.05.2001 | Title | German: | KOPIEREN UND KLONIEREN AN OBERFLÄCHEN | [2001/39] | English: | CLONING AND COPYING ON SURFACES | [2001/39] | French: | CLONAGE ET COPIE SUR DES SURFACES | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 12.05.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 31.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.10.2002 | GR | 16.10.2002 | IE | 16.10.2002 | NL | 16.10.2002 | AT | 26.11.2002 | LU | 26.11.2002 | BE | 30.11.2002 | CY | 30.11.2002 | DK | 16.01.2003 | PT | 16.01.2003 | SE | 16.01.2003 | MC | 01.06.2003 | [2019/12] |
Former [2018/28] | ES | 16.10.2002 | |
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
AT | 26.11.2002 | ||
LU | 26.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
DK | 16.01.2003 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
MC | 01.06.2003 | ||
Former [2007/23] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
AT | 26.11.2002 | ||
LU | 26.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
DK | 16.01.2003 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
MC | 01.06.2003 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
AT | 26.11.2002 | ||
LU | 26.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
MC | 01.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
AT | 26.11.2002 | ||
LU | 26.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
AT | 26.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | GR | 16.10.2002 | |
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 16.10.2002 | |
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 16.10.2002 | |
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 16.01.2003 | |
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 16.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0374665 (MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9317126 (NEW YORK HEALTH RES INST [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9429484 (IMAGEN INC [US]) [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9601836 (NANOGEN INC [US]) [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9604404 (MOSAIC TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9706468 (RABANI ELY MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9707243 (IMMUNIVEST CORP [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9809735 (IBM [US], et al) [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9814610 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9820019 (SEQUENOM INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [DY]US5795714 (CANTOR CHARLES R [US], et al) [DY] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0027521 (SOLEXA LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-27* the whole document *; | [XY] - LUTHER ET AL., "SURFACE-PROMOTED REPLICATION AND EXPONENTIAL AMPLIFICATION OF DNA ANALOGUES", NATURE, (19981119), vol. 396, pages 245 - 248, XP002134112 [X] 1,2,10,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 3-9,11,12,15-27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/24343 |