Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0147654 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK9900737 | 27.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3682260B | Global Dossier | 10.08.2005 | B2 | JP2003518438 | 10.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DK9900737 | 27.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1858100 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DK9900737 | 27.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1250203 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2003 | B1 | EP1250203 | 23.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK9900737 | 27.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69909337T | 27.05.2004 | T2 | DE69909337D1 | 07.08.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DK9900737 | 27.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2203228T | 01.04.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DK9900737 | 27.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6705382 | 16.03.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DK9900737 | 27.12.1999 |