EP1250203 - METHOD OF IMPROVING THE MOULD QUALITY OF A MOULD-FORMING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISA INDUSTRIES A/S Herlev Hovedgade 17 2730 Herlev / DK | [2002/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSEN, Jan, Bechmann Bakkevej 7 DK-3050 Humleb k / DK | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S, Vester Soegade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 99962130.3 | 27.12.1999 | [2002/43] | WO1999DK00737 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0147654 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1250203 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1250203 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B22C11/10, B22C15/02 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
B22C15/02 (EP,US);
B22C11/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES [2003/27] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER GIESSFORMEN EINER GIESSFORMENMASCHIENE | [2002/43] | English: | METHOD OF IMPROVING THE MOULD QUALITY OF A MOULD-FORMING MACHINE | [2002/43] | French: | PROCEDE D'AMELIORATION DE LA QUALITE DES MOULES D'UNE MACHINE A FABRIQUER DES MOULES | [2002/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 17.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5161603 (VOLKOMICH ANATOLY A [SU], et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]US5647424 (LARSEN JENS PETER [DK], et al) [A] 1-7 |