27.02.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
30.01.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.10.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.07.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.03.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.02.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2007 |
First examination report |
|
23.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.04.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
07.04.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.04.2007 |
Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.04.2007 |
Deletion: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.08.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] |
24.08.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] |
27.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|