Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002533095 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9904352 | 22.12.1999 | EP98310567 | 22.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1141397 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9904352 | 22.12.1999 | EP98310567 | 22.12.1998 | EP99962397 | 22.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0037676 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98310567 | 22.12.1998 |