EP1147368 - SHADOW MOIRE SURFACE TOPOLOGY INSPECTION WITH CALIBRATION SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus UK Limited New Filton House, Filton Bristol, BS99 7AR / GB | [2002/25] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'BRIEN, Edwin W., British Aerospace Airbus Ltd. New Filton House, Filton Bristol, Avon BS99 7AR / GB | 02 /
IBBOTSON, Andrew R., British Aerospace Airbus Ltd. New Filton House, Filton Bristol, Avon BS99 7AR / GB | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Edis, Ronald Malcolm, et al BAE Systems plc Group Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Edis, Ronald Malcolm, et al BAE SYSTEMS, Group IP Department, Lancaster House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99962429.9 | 20.12.1999 | [2001/43] | WO1999GB04385 | Priority number, date | GB19980028474 | 24.12.1998 Original published format: GB 9828474 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039523 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1147368 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1147368 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/16 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
G01B11/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHATTEN-MOIRE-OBERFLÄCHENTOPOLOGIEPRÜFUNG MIT EICHPROBEN | [2001/43] | English: | SHADOW MOIRE SURFACE TOPOLOGY INSPECTION WITH CALIBRATION SAMPLES | [2001/43] | French: | MESURE DE LA TOPOLOGIE D'UNE SURFACE AU MOYEN D'UN RESEAU MOIRE UTILISANT DES ECHANTILLONS DE REFERENCE | [2001/43] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 16.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2004 | CH | 20.10.2004 | CY | 20.10.2004 | FI | 20.10.2004 | LI | 20.10.2004 | SE | 20.10.2004 | IE | 20.12.2004 | LU | 20.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | DK | 20.01.2005 | GR | 20.01.2005 | PT | 20.03.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
CY | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
SE | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
LU | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 20.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5000574 (SCOTESE ARTHUR E [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 3 ** column 4, line 27 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [AD]US5619327 (O'BRIEN EDWIN W [GB]) [AD] 1,12 * column 4, line 52 - line 60; figure 3 * |