EP1144415 - FUNCTIONALIZED HETEROCYCLES AS CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states MILLENIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIMAN, Geraldine, C. 50 South Arnolda Road Charlestown, RI 02813 / US | 02 /
KOLZ, Christine, Nylund 6212 Huron Creek Court Dexter, MI 48130 / US | 03 /
LULY, Jay, R. 24 Damien Road Wellesley, MA 02181 / US | 04 /
ROTH, Bruce, David 49255 Hunt Club Court Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | 05 /
SONG, Yuntao 4065 Spring Lake Boulevard Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | 06 /
TRIVEDI, Bharat, Kalidas 36955 Aldgate Court Farmington Hills, MI 48335 / US | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 99963110.4 | 20.12.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999US30434 | Priority number, date | US19990115654P | 13.01.1999 Original published format: US 115654 P | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0042045 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1144415 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/22, A61P31/18, A61K31/438, A61K31/436, C07D491/14, C07D455/02, // (C07D491/22, 311:00, 221:00, 209:00), C07D209:00,(C07D491/14, 311:00, 221:00), C07D209:00,(C07D491/22, 311:00, 221:00, 221:00), C07D209:00,(C07D491/22, 311:00, 223:00, 221:00), C07D209:00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
C07D491/14 (EP,KR);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07D455/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKTIONALISIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE DERIVATE ALS CHEMOKINE-REZEPTOR-MODULATOREN | [2001/42] | English: | FUNCTIONALIZED HETEROCYCLES AS CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR MODULATORS | [2001/42] | French: | HETEROCYCLES FONCTIONNALISES EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DES RECEPTEURS DE CHIMIOKINES | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3518258 (STRANDTMANN MAX VON, et al) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 14 * * column 4; examples 3,4 *; | [A]US3549641 (STRANDTMANN MAXIMILIAN VON, et al) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 48 - line 55 * * column 4 - column 13; examples 2,5,17,19; claim 1 *; | [X]US3565903 (STRANDTMANN MAXIMILIAN VON, et al) [X] 1,10 * column 3; example 2 * * column 1, line 69 - line 72 *; | [A]US5635510 (BURKHOLDER TIMOTHY P [US], et al) [A] 1,10-15 * column 1, line 47 - line 65; table 2 *; | [A]EP0820998 (PLIVA PHARM & CHEM WORKS [HR]) [A] 1,10-15 * example -; claims 1,21 *; | [A]WO9838167 (PFIZER [US], et al) [A] 1,10-15 * abstract * * page 10, line 11 - line 24 * * page 1, line 9 - line 24 *; | [PA]WO9938514 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PA] 1,10-15* abstract *; | [A] - M. VON STRANDTMANN ET AL., "Reaction of Phenolic Mannich Bases with Enamines. General Synthesis of Pyran-Containing Fused Ring Systems.", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY., HETEROCORPORATION. PROVO., US, (1970), vol. 7, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 1311 - 1319, XP002143638 [A] 1 * page 1315; example 31 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570070613 |