EP1140779 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIARYL CARBONATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REISINGER, Claus-Peter Gartenstrasse 61 D-47798 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
JANSEN, Ursula Sprödentalstrasse 84 D-47799 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
RECHNER, Johann Friedrich-Kramer-Strasse 2 D-47906 Kempen / DE | 04 /
EEK, Rob Roggendorfstrasse 63 D-51061 Köln / DE | [2001/41] | Application number, filing date | 99963454.6 | 09.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP09696 | Priority number, date | DE1998159290 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859290 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0037413 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140779 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140779 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C68/00, C07C69/96 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C07C68/01 (EP,US);
C07C68/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C68/01, C07C69/96 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIARYLCARBONATEN | [2001/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIARYL CARBONATES | [2001/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DIARYLCARBONATES | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 31.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.03.2004 | FI | 17.03.2004 | FR | 17.03.2004 | GB | 17.03.2004 | IE | 17.03.2004 | IT | 17.03.2004 | DK | 17.06.2004 | GR | 17.06.2004 | SE | 17.06.2004 | PT | 17.08.2004 | AT | 09.12.2004 | LU | 09.12.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CY | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
FR | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
AT | 09.12.2004 | ||
LU | 09.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
FR | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
AT | 09.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
FR | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
SE | 17.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0749955 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 10; claim - ** figures 1,4 *; | [X]EP0801051 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 3, column 3, line 41 - page 5, column 7, line 9 * * page 5, column 8, line 1 - line 10 * * page 6, column 10, line 40 - line 51 * * page 9 - page 10; claim - * |