EP1152833 - METHOD AND PRODUCTION PLANT FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF FIBROUS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper, Inc. Fabianinkatu 9 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIPILÄ, Kai Nokitontunkuja 3 D 25 FIN-02200 Espoo / FI | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Allan Sepänkatu 19 A 19 FIN-00150 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
KARLSSON, Markku Telluksenkatu 8 FIN-21600 Parainen / FI | 04 /
RISTOLA, Petri Männikkötie 5 K 56 FIN-00630 Helsinki / FI | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99963624.4 | 17.12.1999 | [2001/46] | WO1999FI01056 | Priority number, date | FI19980002737 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: FI 982737 | [2001/46] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0035588 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152833 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152833 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B03B9/06, D21B1/02, C10B53/00 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
B03B9/061 (EP,US);
C10L5/46 (EP,US);
D21B1/026 (EP,US);
D21B1/32 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US);
Y02W30/64 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FASERWERKSTOFFEN | [2001/46] | English: | METHOD AND PRODUCTION PLANT FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF FIBROUS MATERIAL | [2001/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET USINE DE PRODUCTION DE MATIERE FIBREUSE | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2000 | Translation filed | 13.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 18.02.2004 | CY | 18.02.2004 | LI | 18.02.2004 | DK | 18.05.2004 | GR | 18.05.2004 | SE | 18.05.2004 | PT | 18.07.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CH | 18.02.2004 | |
CY | 18.02.2004 | ||
LI | 18.02.2004 | ||
DK | 18.05.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 18.02.2004 | |
LI | 18.02.2004 | ||
DK | 18.05.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | CH | 18.02.2004 | |
LI | 18.02.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 18.05.2004 | |
SE | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 18.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3765921 (PUSKAR V) [Y] 9-12,29-31; | [X]GB1364474 (BLACK CLAWSON FIBRECLAIM INC) [X] 1-3,13,21-24; | [XY]GB2026019 (BABCOCK KRAUSS MAFFEI IND) [X] 1-8,14,15,21-28,35 [Y] 9-12,16-20,29-34; | [Y]WO9512549 (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR IND AB [SE], et al)[Y] 16-20,32-34 |